TN HB2905 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Pursuant to the request of the Tenth Special School District of Wilson County, shortens the terms of the board of directors from six years to four years. - Amends Chapter 330 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 330 of the Acts of 1901; as amended by Chapter 99 of the Private Acts of 1943; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to terms of the board of directors of the Tenth Special School District of Wilson County.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Pr. Ch. 57 | |
2022-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2921 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 57