TN HB2863 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the department of human resources assist each department and entity of state government in the planning and conducting of training seminars, in addition to workshops, to prevent sexual harassment from occurring. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, requires that the department of human resources assist each department and entity of state government in the planning and conducting of training seminars, in addition to workshops, to prevent sexual harassment from occurring. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2907 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee