TN HB2855 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a health benefit plan from denying payment or coverage for emergency services if the symptoms presented by an enrollee of a health benefit plan and recorded by the attending provider indicate that an emergency medical condition could exist, regardless of the final diagnosis of the symptoms. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23, relative to coverage of emergency services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 784 | |
2022-03-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2386 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022