TN HB2841 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a director of schools, or the director's designee, to report truant student absences to the appropriate judge if any tier of a progressive truancy intervention plan is unsuccessful, and before subsequent tiers are implemented, if the school can document that the student's parent or guardian is unwilling to cooperate in the truancy intervention plan. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a director of schools, or the director's designee, to report truant student absences to the appropriate judge if any tier of a progressive truancy intervention plan is unsuccessful, and before subsequent tiers are implemented, if the school can document that the student's parent or guardian is unwilling to cooperate in the truancy intervention plan. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 748 | |
2020-06-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2620 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 748