TN HB2840 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the bureau to, in consultation with and approval of the commissioner of finance and administration, develop and implement a program substantially similar to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services’ Emergency Triage, Treat, and Transport model for emergency services. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2319 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022