TN HB2840 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person who is released on the person's personal recognizance or an unsecured appearance bond to report any change of address or change of employment that occurs while the person's case is pending to the clerk of the court having jurisdiction over the criminal charge within five business days of the change. - Amends TCA Title 18 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
As introduced, requires a person who is released on the person's personal recognizance or an unsecured appearance bond to report any change of address or change of employment that occurs while the person's case is pending to the clerk of the court having jurisdiction over the criminal charge within five business days of the change. - Amends TCA Title 18 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2736 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee