TN HB2833 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 584
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 584
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends until June 30, 2013, for Donate Life new specialty earmarked license plates to obtain the minimum number of orders for issuance of such license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, extends until June 30, 2013, for Donate Life new specialty earmarked license plates to obtain the minimum number of orders for issuance of such license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 584 | |
2012-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/12 | |
2012-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-01 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 2 | |
2012-02-23 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/27/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-01-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3124 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 584