TN HB2832 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes the current manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions permanent. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes the current manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions permanent. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-05-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-05-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-05-19HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-18HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2523 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback