TN HB2825 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an agency that promulgates a new permanent rule to identify and repeal one existing permanent rule. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires an agency that promulgates a new permanent rule to identify and repeal one existing permanent rule. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-03-13 | House | Re-ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-24 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2594 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee