TN HB2822 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that fees paid by a defendant requesting pretrial diversion are to be deposited in the general fund; specifies the remittance and allowed uses of certain fees under the sexual offender registry provisions; makes other statutory revisions necessary to implementation of the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that fees paid by a defendant requesting pretrial diversion are to be deposited in the general fund; specifies the remittance and allowed uses of certain fees under the sexual offender registry provisions; makes other statutory revisions necessary to implementation of the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseH. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2020
2020-03-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2467 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback