TN HB2821 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes appropriations for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes appropriations for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 5 by Yarbro (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 7 by Robinson (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY PARKINSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 10 BY BECK PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 14 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 19 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY PARKINSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE AMENDMENT # 7 BY HODGES PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY LOVE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY JOHNSON G. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 2, PNV 1
2020-03-19SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 7 - SA0669)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - SA0668)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 5 - SA0667)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0666)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0665)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0664)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0663)
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 3, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseMotion to consider am. (Amendment 14 - HA0708) failed.
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 13 - HA0706)
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 12 - HA0705)
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 11 - HA0704)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 10 - HA0703)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 8 - HA0701)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 9 - HA0702)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0700)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0699)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0698)
2020-03-19HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0697)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0696)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0695)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0694)
2020-03-19HouseH. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2020
2020-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2466 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2821&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB2821.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0694.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0695.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0696.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0697.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0698.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0699.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0700.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0703.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0704.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0705.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0706.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0708.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2821&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback