TN HB2818 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 68-19)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows local boards of education to enter into continuing contracts governing the use of some or all of the LEA's schools in case of casualty losses or natural disasters. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows local boards of education to enter into continuing contracts governing the use of some or all of the LEA's schools in case of casualty losses or natural disasters. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors

Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]
Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]

Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0656)
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0688)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0677)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0676)
2020-03-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-16HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-16HouseRef. to Education Committee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2672 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback