TN HB2817 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 30 days to 45 days the time within which the issuing judge is required to report to the attorney general following the expiration, extension, or denial of an order authorizing a wire, oral, or electronic interception. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 33; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, extends from 30 days to 45 days the time within which the issuing judge is required to report to the attorney general following the expiration, extension, or denial of an order authorizing a wire, oral, or electronic interception. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 33; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2671 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee