TN HB2816 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Failed in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Failed in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to prepare and provide a report on the initial and ongoing training received by probation and parole officers regarding graduated sanctions for violations of supervision conditions upon request by a standing committee of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 71, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to prepare and provide a report on the initial and ongoing training received by probation and parole officers regarding graduated sanctions for violations of supervision conditions upon request by a standing committee of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 71, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Failed in Judiciary Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-09 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2674 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee