TN HB2786 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 calendar days to 10 business days, the number of days before a public hearing on an ordinance or resolution creating a regional airport authority by which notice of the public hearing must be given. - Amends TCA Title 42, Chapter 3 and Title 42, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 42, Chapter 3 and Title 42, Chapter 4, relative to airport authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tandy Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2917 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee