TN HB2776 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines the terms "economic development" and "project" to include incentives that promote the development of single-family housing, for purposes of laws governing projects by industrial development corporations and contributions to industrial development corporations by municipalities. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 7, Chapter 53.
Title
As introduced, defines the terms "economic development" and "project" to include incentives that promote the development of single-family housing, for purposes of laws governing projects by industrial development corporations and contributions to industrial development corporations by municipalities. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 7, Chapter 53.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0611) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2663 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, as amended