TN HB2771 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the type of equipment for which law enforcement agencies may exchange confiscated weapons to include any equipment suitable for use for legitimate law enforcement purposes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, expands the type of equipment for which law enforcement agencies may exchange confiscated weapons to include any equipment suitable for use for legitimate law enforcement purposes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2420 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020