TN HB2766 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines the term "teacher" for purposes of state salary increases for licensed education personnel. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, defines the term "teacher" for purposes of state salary increases for licensed education personnel. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2652 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee