TN HB2765 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the board of parole may consider the prisoner's good conduct or efficient performance of duties assigned to the prisoner in prison when determining whether parole should be granted. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 28.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 28, relative to grounds for parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2518 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee