TN HB2764 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 857
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 857
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a person meet the residency requirements for state senators and representatives contained in the Tennessee constitution in order to qualify as a candidate in a primary election for congress. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to the selection of candidates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 857 | |
2022-03-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2616 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2022