TN HB2741 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from December 15 to December 7, the date by which the commission on compensation is required to report to the governor and the general assembly, each year in which the commission is convened, the commission's recommendation concerning the compensation of the governor, commissioners, constitutional officers, legislators, and other officials. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 56, relative to compensation and benefits for public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2527 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.