TN HB2733 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an employer to allow a veteran employee to have the entirety of Veterans' Day as a non-paid holiday if certain conditions met; specifies that this act does not prohibit an employer from allowing the employer's veteran employees to have the entirety of Veterans Day as a paid holiday. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 15; Title 50 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 15; Title 50 and Title 58, relative to Veterans' Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 854 | |
2022-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0731) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0681) |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/22 |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2879 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854