TN HB2727 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the fiscal review committee must be allowed to review noncompetitive procurement agreements; requires the chief procurement officer to report procurement contracts monthly to the fiscal review committee; revises various other provisions related to procurement of state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the fiscal review committee must be allowed to review noncompetitive procurement agreements; requires the chief procurement officer to report procurement contracts monthly to the fiscal review committee; revises various other provisions related to procurement of state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0654) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2715 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020