TN HB2717 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for county officials in Henry County upon approval by referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for county officials in Henry County upon approval by referendum. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2747 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.