TN HB2712 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the requirements for the first and second tiers of a local board of education's progressive truancy intervention plan. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Title
As introduced, revises the requirements for the first and second tiers of a local board of education's progressive truancy intervention plan. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Held on desk. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2584 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee