TN HB2709 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a social media company to obtain parental consent before allowing a minor to create an account or access an already existing account; prohibits a social media company from using practices, designs, or features on the social media platform that the social media company knows or should know cause minors to develop an addiction to the social media platform. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 47, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to social media.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2024-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee- Government Operations for Review
2024-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2372 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback