TN HB2709 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, prohibits the mayor and aldermen from being eligible for the succeeding term in the same office if such official has served more than one-half of a four-year term and the next two subsequent four-year terms, for a maximum of 10 years in that particular office. - Amends Chapter 67 of the Private Acts of 1953.
Title
Subject to local approval, prohibits the mayor and aldermen from being eligible for the succeeding term in the same office if such official has served more than one-half of a four-year term and the next two subsequent four-year terms, for a maximum of 10 years in that particular office. - Amends Chapter 67 of the Private Acts of 1953.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pr. Ch. 51 | |
2018-04-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1142) |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2084 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
SB2738 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 51
SB2738 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 51