TN HB2706 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, removes probate and conservatorship jurisdiction from the Probate and Juvenile Court of Dickson County; renames court Juvenile Court of Dickson County. - Amends Chapter 267 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Title
Subject to local approval, removes probate and conservatorship jurisdiction from the Probate and Juvenile Court of Dickson County; renames court Juvenile Court of Dickson County. - Amends Chapter 267 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pr. Ch. 43 | |
2018-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1035) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2734 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 43