TN HB2705 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 66-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a five-member Asian carp advisory commission to recommend methods and seek funding for the eradication of Asian carp from Tennessee waters. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a five-member Asian carp advisory commission to recommend methods and seek funding for the eradication of Asian carp from Tennessee waters. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.

Sponsors

Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]
Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1025)
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1016)
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0781)
2020-06-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/15/2020
2020-06-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-09HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseMeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2690 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback