TN HB2702 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that the current prohibition against traffic offense citation quotas is applicable to public officials or public employees; creates a Class B misdemeanor offense, subject to fine only, for officials and employees violating that prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that the current prohibition against traffic offense citation quotas is applicable to public officials or public employees; creates a Class B misdemeanor offense, subject to fine only, for officials and employees violating that prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-11HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2458 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback