TN HB2690 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state funding board to report to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and the transportation committee of the house of representatives on the utility relocation loan program funded from gas taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the state funding board to report to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and the transportation committee of the house of representatives on the utility relocation loan program funded from gas taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2597 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee