TN HB2689 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a “Parents' Day Out” or similar program operated by a religious institution or organization to provide 12-hour per week child care services in whatever block of time desired; requires the department of human services to create a $10 million fund to provide unlicensed care providers in rural counties with assistance in making facility upgrades for licensure; allows care providers in rural counties to provide child care for up to 10 children without being licensed if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a “Parents' Day Out” or similar program operated by a religious institution or organization to provide 12-hour per week child care services in whatever block of time desired; requires the department of human services to create a $10 million fund to provide unlicensed care providers in rural counties with assistance in making facility upgrades for licensure; allows care providers in rural counties to provide child care for up to 10 children without being licensed if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY POWELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY POWELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA1001) |
2020-06-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0797) |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2777 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee