TN HB2688 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $2,000 to $3,000, the amount per violation assessed by the secretary of state as a civil penalty against a sanctioned nonresident alien, sanctioned foreign business, sanctioned foreign government, or agent, trustee, or other fiduciary thereof, for failing to timely register with the secretary of state an interest in real property in this state on or after July 1, 2023, held by such individual or entity. - Amends TCA Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, relative to property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2702 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee