TN HB2676 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, for each emergency purchase the central procurement office approves, the reporting of certain information, as specified in this amendment, to the fiscal review committee within 30 days of the approval; creates certain exemptions. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49, relative to procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1076 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0775) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0830) |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-03-14 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1977 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1076