TN HB2673 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "micro market" and "micro market display" for purposes of sales and use taxes; authorizes dealers who own and operate micro markets in multiple locations to submit to the department of revenue a single monthly sales tax return and payment from sales made at all micro markets owned and operated by the dealer. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, defines "micro market" and "micro market display" for purposes of sales and use taxes; authorizes dealers who own and operate micro markets in multiple locations to submit to the department of revenue a single monthly sales tax return and payment from sales made at all micro markets owned and operated by the dealer. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0834) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2127 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 12/1/2020