TN HB2673 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires category 7 pest control applicators to acquire 15 points of continuing education every three years with an annual maximum of eight points. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires category 7 pest control applicators to acquire 15 points of continuing education every three years with an annual maximum of eight points. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 2/15/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2543 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2673&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2673.pdf |