TN HB2672 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes owners of real property to construct certain residential buildings on that property without obtaining a contractor license; requires notice of such construction to be made to the board for licensing contractors, the register of deeds, and subsequent purchasers of the property. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, authorizes owners of real property to construct certain residential buildings on that property without obtaining a contractor license; requires notice of such construction to be made to the board for licensing contractors, the register of deeds, and subsequent purchasers of the property. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 8, PNV 7 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0831) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2029 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020