TN HB2672 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, appropriates receipts of highway revenues to the department of transportation; earmarks sufficient state funds for the purpose of funding any bill naming a highway or bridge in honor of a service member or a public safety official killed in the line of duty.
Title
As introduced, appropriates receipts of highway revenues to the department of transportation; earmarks sufficient state funds for the purpose of funding any bill naming a highway or bridge in honor of a service member or a public safety official killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/16/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1488 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
SB2702 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
SB2702 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee