TN HB2666 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes a provision regarding how the Tennessee POST commission determines if a retired law enforcement officer is eligible to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, removes a provision regarding how the Tennessee POST commission determines if a retired law enforcement officer is eligible to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2893 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee