TN HB2661 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a person to carry a handgun in a concealed manner; permits a person carrying a handgun in a concealed manner to carry in parks, higher education campuses, and areas posted by local governments in the same manner permitted by handgun carry permit holders. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Title 39; Section 50-1-312; Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Section 70-5-101.
Title
As introduced, permits a person to carry a handgun in a concealed manner; permits a person carrying a handgun in a concealed manner to carry in parks, higher education campuses, and areas posted by local governments in the same manner permitted by handgun carry permit holders. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Title 39; Section 50-1-312; Title 70, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Section 70-5-101.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2888 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020