TN HB2660 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that a person who uses justifiable force against another may request a stay of proceedings in any civil action based on the use of force until the criminal investigation has concluded; creates an immunity hearing at which the court may dismiss an action that is barred by immunity. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, provides that a person who uses justifiable force against another may request a stay of proceedings in any civil action based on the use of force until the criminal investigation has concluded; creates an immunity hearing at which the court may dismiss an action that is barred by immunity. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0764) |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0713) |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2527 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020