TN HB2658 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commission to levy certain fines and suspend the server permit of a person for certain violations, including the sale of alcohol or beer to a person who is under 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-203.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-203, relative to alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-27HouseTaken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
2024-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024
2024-03-20HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/27/2024
2024-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024
2024-03-13HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-06HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2024-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2024
2024-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2024-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2024-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2355 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback