TN HB2646 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, deletes the Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |