TN HB2646 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 77 of the Private Acts of 1977.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 77 of the Private Acts of 1977.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41 | |
2016-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-03-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2668 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 41