TN HB2636 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds representatives of groups representing recreational users of streams to the advisory committee to the division of water pollution control to advise and assist the division on procedures and policies concerning the application of the Water Quality Control Act to the removal of debris from streams and stabilization of stream banks. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, adds representatives of groups representing recreational users of streams to the advisory committee to the division of water pollution control to advise and assist the division on procedures and policies concerning the application of the Water Quality Control Act to the removal of debris from streams and stabilization of stream banks. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0863) |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0778) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2219 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Comm.