TN HB2635 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Hendersonville to add the storm water user's fee to the real property tax notice, subject to passage of an ordinance by a two-thirds majority of the legislative body. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-103.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Hendersonville to add the storm water user's fee to the real property tax notice, subject to passage of an ordinance by a two-thirds majority of the legislative body. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-103.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2420 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 922