TN HB2634 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA to allocate prorated daily per pupil state and local funding to an out-of-state residential mental health facility if a student of the LEA is admitted to the facility and certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires an LEA to allocate prorated daily per pupil state and local funding to an out-of-state residential mental health facility if a student of the LEA is admitted to the facility and certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2774 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1