TN HB2628 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises provisions governing penalties for noncompliance with workers' compensation coverage requirements. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, revises provisions governing penalties for noncompliance with workers' compensation coverage requirements. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2404 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2628&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB2628.pdf |