TN HB2626 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than October 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than October 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2463 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee