TN HB2620 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, raises the permissible fine for aggravated assault to no more than $15,000, in addition to any authorized term of imprisonment. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, raises the permissible fine for aggravated assault to no more than $15,000, in addition to any authorized term of imprisonment. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2273 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee